U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Scott v. Otter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 01, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 05, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [ADR Plan]
  • June 07, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2017: [Status Conference]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 14, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 02, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Order]
  • July 23, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 17, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 17, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 10, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • July 06, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 06, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 06, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order]
  • July 01, 2015: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • June 24, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 16, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 12, 2015: [Consolidate Cases]
February, 2015
  • February 25, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.