U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Gregory v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 20, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 18, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 28, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • March 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2015
  • February 25, 2015: [Order Staying Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.