U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Kaelin v. Blades et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 06, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • May 19, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 13, 2015: [Supplement]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 04, 2015: [Reconsideration]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order]
  • October 28, 2015: [Request]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • October 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 22, 2015: [Supplement]
  • September 02, 2015: [Joinder]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 26, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 25, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 24, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 18, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 16, 2015: [Letter]
  • July 16, 2015: [Response to Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Letter]
  • June 29, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 26, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 26, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 23, 2015: [Show Cause]
  • June 18, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 17, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 17, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2015
  • March 03, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.