U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Vantage Dairy Supplies LLC et al v. Teck American Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 07, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 28, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 23, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Exclude]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Order]
  • September 01, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 01, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 05, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order]
  • March 17, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 11, 2016: [Discovery]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 01, 2016: [Protective Order]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 16, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Order]
  • September 08, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 03, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Consent Filed]
March, 2015
  • March 05, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.