U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Morgan v. Idaho Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 06, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Request]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 11, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 31, 2015: [Response (generic)]
  • August 20, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 06, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 04, 2015: [Response to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 10, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • July 10, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 10, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 07, 2015: [Request]
March, 2015
  • March 04, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.