U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Wakeley v. Bonner County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 26, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [Stipulation]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 03, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 03, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Order]
  • July 31, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 23, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 14, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
March, 2015
  • March 06, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.