U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Lish v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [USCA Order]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 20, 2015: [Letter]
  • November 12, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 12, 2015: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Default Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Response (generic)]
  • July 28, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 28, 2015: [Order]
March, 2015
  • March 09, 2015: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.