U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Hersey v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 29, 2016: [Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Appellants Reply Brief]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 10, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 09, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • June 15, 2015: [Administrative Record]
March, 2015
  • March 12, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.