U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Wood et al v. Panther et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 23, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • October 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Return Mail]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Clarify]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 11, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • January 11, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order]
  • December 22, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Supplement]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2016: [Letter]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Jury Demand]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 23, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 01, 2015: [Extension of Time to Amend]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 10, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 09, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 01, 2015: [Receipt]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 30, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 30, 2015: [Order]
  • September 30, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Errata]
  • August 20, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 20, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 20, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2015
  • March 17, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.