U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Hyden v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
  • October 01, 2015: [Response (generic)]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 10, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • June 24, 2015: [Administrative Record]
March, 2015
  • March 19, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.