U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Moras v. Albertsons, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 10, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
  • September 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 25, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 07, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 07, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 03, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 02, 2016: [Statement]
  • May 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2016: [Certify Class]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 08, 2016: [Declaration]
  • April 08, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 03, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Protective Order]
July, 2015
  • July 08, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2015
  • March 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.