U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00122
  • Case Name: Garcia v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • December 13, 2017: [Reopen Case]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Letter]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Request]
  • December 12, 2016: [USCA Order]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Request]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Reply (generic)]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2015
  • July 01, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 01, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 01, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • June 24, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2015
  • April 13, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.