U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00085
  • Case Name: Hansen et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Response to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2016: [Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 02, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • April 25, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 23, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 23, 2015: [Declaration]
  • October 07, 2015: [Response to Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Sanctions]
  • September 16, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • September 16, 2015: [Declaration]
  • September 04, 2015: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 04, 2015: [Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Order]
  • July 20, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 10, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 23, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2015
  • April 14, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.