U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00125
  • Case Name: Adams v. Blue Cross of Idaho Health Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 20, 2015: [Stipulation]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Order]
  • July 24, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 24, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 16, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • July 09, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 25, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • June 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 17, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2015
  • April 14, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.