U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00132
  • Case Name: Brown v. Dobler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 29, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • November 11, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 02, 2016: [Request]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 31, 2016: [Declaration]
  • October 31, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • October 27, 2016: [Joinder]
  • October 17, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Relief]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Request]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 13, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 12, 2016: [Declaration]
  • May 12, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 11, 2016: [Consolidate Cases]
  • May 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2016: [Request]
  • April 06, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 06, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Supplement]
  • February 17, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • February 17, 2016: [Sanctions]
  • February 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Supplement]
  • January 11, 2016: [Relief]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 04, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 04, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Compel]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 16, 2015: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • November 10, 2015: [Request]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 23, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • October 23, 2015: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 22, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 20, 2015: [Supplement]
  • October 20, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • October 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 06, 2015: [Letter]
  • October 05, 2015: [Response to Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 16, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 14, 2015: [Sanctions]
  • September 14, 2015: [Reply (generic)]
  • September 04, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 04, 2015: [Request]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 27, 2015: [Request]
  • August 27, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 25, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 14, 2015: [Request]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Letter]
  • July 29, 2015: [Waiver]
  • July 29, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 08, 2015: [Consent Filed]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • June 26, 2015: [Order]
  • June 26, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
April, 2015
  • April 22, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.