U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00139
  • Case Name: Rose v. Werner Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 10, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order]
  • August 10, 2016: [Compel]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Order]
  • February 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 17, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 12, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 02, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Order]
  • July 27, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 24, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 08, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 06, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
April, 2015
  • April 28, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.