U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Mickelsen Farms, LLC et al v. Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service (APHIS) et a
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 14, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 11, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 10, 2015: [Response to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 01, 2015: [Consent Filed]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 12, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • June 12, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2015
  • April 28, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.