U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00141
  • Case Name: ZM et al v. Independent School District of Boise City et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 12, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 05, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 05, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Order]
  • September 21, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 17, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • September 08, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 08, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 17, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 17, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 12, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 07, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • August 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 07, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 12, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • June 12, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 12, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
April, 2015
  • April 28, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.