U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00148
  • Case Name: Daniels v. Blades et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Letter]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 09, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 08, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2016: [Discovery]
  • June 14, 2016: [Receipt]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 11, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • April 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 23, 2016: [Request]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 11, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 11, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Letter]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 27, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 27, 2015: [Letter]
  • August 18, 2015: [Order]
  • August 18, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 18, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2015
  • April 30, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.