U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00146
  • Case Name: Harrison v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • August 15, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 03, 2017: [Judgment - Attorney Fees]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • July 20, 2017: [Supplement]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order]
  • July 12, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • February 23, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • February 23, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 23, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • February 23, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 23, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Jury Verdict]
  • February 03, 2017: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • February 03, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 03, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • February 01, 2017: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • February 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 01, 2017: [Jury Selection (sealed)]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Objection]
  • January 24, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 24, 2017: [Objection]
  • January 20, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 20, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 19, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 17, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • January 17, 2017: [Witness List]
  • January 17, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 17, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 17, 2017: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • January 17, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 17, 2017: [Trial Brief]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order]
  • January 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 03, 2017: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • January 03, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 06, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • December 06, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 05, 2016: [Discovery]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Declaration]
  • November 29, 2016: [In Limine]
  • November 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order]
  • November 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 19, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 14, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Declaration]
  • July 11, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Relief]
  • May 05, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2016: [Relief]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 21, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 17, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 11, 2015: [Stipulation]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 22, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order]
  • September 02, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 04, 2015: [Consent Filed]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 17, 2015: [Leave to File Document]
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 13, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 01, 2015: [Stipulation]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2015
  • April 30, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.