U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00149
  • Case Name: Dew v. Edmunds et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 25, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2015
  • August 03, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • July 15, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 10, 2015: [Order]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 30, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 30, 2015: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 29, 2015: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • June 29, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 26, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • June 26, 2015: [Stay]
  • June 25, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2015
  • May 01, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.