U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cv-00480
  • Case Name: Weimer v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Receipt]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Order]
  • February 10, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • February 01, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Letter]
October, 2015
  • October 06, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 06, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order]
  • July 17, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2015
  • May 05, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.