U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Myers v. Ignarro et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2015: [Dismiss]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • August 21, 2015: [Supplement]
  • August 07, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 03, 2015: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • July 28, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 17, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order]
  • July 13, 2015: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 10, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • July 10, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 26, 2015: [File Excess Pages]
  • June 26, 2015: [Expedite]
  • June 17, 2015: [Dismiss]
May, 2015
  • May 06, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.