U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00151
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 30, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Reply (generic)]
  • November 06, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • September 08, 2015: [Administrative Record]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 23, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • June 23, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
May, 2015
  • May 06, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.