U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00154
  • Case Name: Ketterer v. Emerson Electric Co. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 23, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order]
  • September 16, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • April 04, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Protective Order]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 08, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 07, 2015: [Consent Filed]
May, 2015
  • May 07, 2015: [Declaration]
  • May 06, 2015: [Declaration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.