U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00156
  • Case Name: Miller v. Lemhi County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 01, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 18, 2018: [Errata]
  • April 17, 2018: [Objection]
  • April 11, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 10, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 09, 2018: [Objection]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Declaration]
  • November 29, 2017: [In Limine]
  • November 29, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 29, 2017: [Trial Brief]
  • November 29, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 29, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 29, 2017: [Witness List]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order]
  • September 05, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2016: [Strike]
  • September 15, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Strike]
  • August 24, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 22, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • June 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Order]
  • September 18, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • September 18, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 12, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 04, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 15, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2015
  • May 07, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.