U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cv-00157
  • Case Name: Newman v. Blades et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Request]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Response (generic)]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 05, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2015
  • May 08, 2015: [Reopen Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.