U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00157
  • Case Name: Hubbard v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • March 03, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order]
  • March 03, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 03, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2016: [Clarify]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Clarify]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order]
  • October 19, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 15, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2015
  • May 08, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.