U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00160
  • Case Name: Sayers v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 06, 2016: [Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 02, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Remand to Agency]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Declaration]
  • February 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 10, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 05, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 16, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Administrative Record]
  • November 19, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 15, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 09, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
May, 2015
  • May 11, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.