U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Suter et al v. Carter
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 31, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2016: [Dismiss]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Witness List]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Joinder]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2015
  • May 12, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.