U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-00088
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Owyhee Construction Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Consent Decree]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Order]
  • December 17, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 08, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order]
  • December 08, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 04, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Discovery]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • August 03, 2015: [Answer to Crossclaim]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Order]
  • July 17, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 17, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 13, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Order]
  • June 15, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2015
  • May 12, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.