U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00161
  • Case Name: Loper v. Sagle Fire District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Order]
  • December 18, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2015: [Stipulation]
October, 2015
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 02, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 20, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • August 18, 2015: [Consolidate Cases]
  • August 13, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 13, 2015: [Order]
  • August 07, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2015
  • July 01, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 29, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
May, 2015
  • May 13, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.