U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00162
  • Case Name: Fitch v. Blades et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 30, 2017: [Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 12, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 08, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Consolidate Cases]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • May 09, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 06, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • December 14, 2015: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 02, 2015: [Consent Filed]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 20, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 20, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 19, 2015: [Waiver]
  • August 19, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order]
  • July 17, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • July 17, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2015
  • May 14, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.