U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00165
  • Case Name: Stanton v. Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 06, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • September 28, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • September 25, 2015: [Stipulation]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 27, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 27, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
May, 2015
  • May 14, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.