U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00136
  • Case Name: Olson v. S&S Restaurants LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 04, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of Settlement]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Staying Case]
  • November 20, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 20, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2015: [Stay]
  • November 13, 2015: [Consent Filed]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Stay]
  • October 20, 2015: [Settlement Conference]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order]
  • September 08, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 04, 2015: [Stay]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 15, 2015: [Order Staying Case]
  • June 15, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 12, 2015: [Stay]
May, 2015
  • May 14, 2015: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.