U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-00163
  • Case Name: Hyten v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • February 04, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 02, 2015: [Administrative Record]
  • November 02, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • August 24, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 20, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 18, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2015
  • May 14, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.