U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Corwin v. Wengler
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Return Mail]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 31, 2015: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2015: [Return Mail]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order]
  • July 15, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 15, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
May, 2015
  • May 18, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.