U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00168
  • Case Name: Ward v. Red Robin International, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 17, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order]
  • January 12, 2016: [Stipulation]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Withdraw]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 07, 2015: [Protective Order]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Order]
  • August 18, 2015: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 18, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 18, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 14, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [Consent Filed]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • June 23, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
May, 2015
  • May 18, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.