U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00166
  • Case Name: Fletcher v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [USCA Order]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 02, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • July 19, 2018: [Request]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2018: [Strike]
  • June 14, 2018: [Supplement]
  • June 12, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 12, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • June 06, 2018: [Return Mail]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 15, 2018: [Preliminary Injunction]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 14, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 21, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Order]
  • October 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Supplement]
  • September 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • September 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 28, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • August 15, 2017: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • August 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 25, 2017: [Supplement]
  • July 10, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • July 10, 2017: [Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Strike]
  • May 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2017: [Letter]
  • March 02, 2017: [Request]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Request]
  • January 17, 2017: [Request]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • December 02, 2016: [Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2016: [Request]
  • November 14, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • November 02, 2016: [Declaration]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • October 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order]
  • October 04, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • September 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • August 15, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 08, 2016: [Reopen Case]
  • August 02, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • August 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2016: [Strike]
  • July 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Strike]
  • June 09, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2016: [Request]
  • June 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2016: [Supplement]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Strike]
  • April 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Stay]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 23, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 07, 2016: [Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • January 26, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Supplement]
  • December 21, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Response to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 26, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • October 20, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 08, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 01, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order]
  • September 28, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Supplement]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Order]
  • July 17, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 17, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2015
  • May 19, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.