U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00129
  • Case Name: Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Idahoan Foods LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 03, 2020: [USCA Memorandum]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 16, 2018: [Receipt]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • October 03, 2017: [Costs Taxed]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • May 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 03, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 20, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2016: [Errata]
  • May 13, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • May 02, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 11, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order]
  • January 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • January 07, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Protective Order]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Stipulation]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [ADR Plan]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Order]
  • July 14, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 01, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
May, 2015
  • May 19, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.