U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00073
  • Case Name: Ferguson v. Agler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [USCA Order]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [USCA Order]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Request]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [USCA Order]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 13, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Response to Objection to R&R]
  • July 05, 2016: [Response to Objection to R&R]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • June 17, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 15, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 09, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 19, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 19, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 18, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 14, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2016: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • March 18, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 18, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Request]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Response (generic)]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 16, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Response (generic)]
  • August 31, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Response (generic)]
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • July 13, 2015: [Strike]
  • July 13, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2015
  • May 19, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.