U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Swisher v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [USCA Order]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 26, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 13, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [New Trial]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Letter]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [USCA Order]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [USCA Memorandum]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [USCA Order]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [USCA Order]
May, 2015
  • May 20, 2015: [USCA Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.