U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00170
  • Case Name: Plaster v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Appeal Record Returned]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [USCA Order]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
December, 2015
  • December 24, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 23, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order]
  • December 10, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 10, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2015
  • May 20, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.