U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00172
  • Case Name: castillo v. Klitch et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 09, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • December 06, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 13, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • May 17, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • February 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2015
  • May 21, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.