U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00171
  • Case Name: Kelley v. Public Defender's Office of Kootenai County, Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Return Mail]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Return Mail]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order]
  • October 13, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2015
  • September 09, 2015: [Supplement]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2015
  • July 08, 2015: [Supplement]
May, 2015
  • May 21, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.