U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00175
  • Case Name: Ashley v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [USCA Order]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 09, 2016: [Dismiss]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 17, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2015
  • May 26, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.