U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00177
  • Case Name: Arvish v. CradlePoint, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Dismiss]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 18, 2015: [Order]
  • August 18, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 14, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 13, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 07, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Consent Filed]
May, 2015
  • May 26, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.