U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00178
  • Case Name: Woras v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 08, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order]
  • June 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 01, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 23, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Dismiss]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 08, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Consent Filed]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 23, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 19, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 06, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 05, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 06, 2015: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order]
  • August 05, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2015
  • May 27, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.