U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00063
  • Case Name: Dill v. Goleck et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 04, 2016: [Dismiss]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 29, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 29, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Order]
  • August 20, 2015: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • August 18, 2015: [Reply (generic)]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Service]
  • July 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 18, 2015: [Service]
May, 2015
  • May 28, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.