U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00184
  • Case Name: Johnson et al v. United States Postal Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 24, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 20, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 04, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 30, 2015: [Substitute Party]
  • July 30, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 16, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 16, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2015
  • May 28, 2015: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.